Financial history THATCHAM TORNADOES FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1109499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £69.80k £52.27k £76.34k £98.04k £104.04k
Total expenditure £54.29k £31.67k £72.34k £72.34k £93.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A