THATCHAM TORNADOES FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Thatcham and its surrounding area, in particular the provision of facilities for the playing of football to advance the education of young people under the age of eighteen so as to promote and encourage their physical development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 17 May 2005: Standard registration
- THATCHAM TORNADOES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Phillip Hillen | Chair | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Williams | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Herriott | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Davies | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Leno | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jon Schofield | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Harrison | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicolas Prior | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARY KEITH BROOKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE CORCORAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.80k | £52.27k | £76.34k | £98.04k | £104.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.29k | £31.67k | £72.34k | £72.34k | £93.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THATCHAM AND IT'S SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN SO AS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THEIR PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
THATCHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 ALEXANDER ROAD
THATCHAM
RG19 4QU
- Phone:
- 01635866036
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window