Accounts and annual returns ETHNIC MINORITIES WIDOWS/WIDOWERS ORGANISATION UK LIMITED

Charity Number: 1105900
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 26 October 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 26 October 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 October 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 05 October 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 September 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 30 September 2022 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 December 2021 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 December 2021 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 09 April 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 09 April 2021 221 days late Download Open in new window