ETHNIC MINORITIES WIDOWS/WIDOWERS ORGANISATION UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make donations of household goods such as clothing & cooking utensils. We provide domestic support, run a charity shop. We visit people (elderly & vulnerable widows & widowers & their families). We help every widows & widowers with their other needs but not money (cash) because we are in debt. We will help with finance fund when the shop picks up and we've cleared our debt.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 September 2004: Standard registration
- EMWWOU (Working name)
- EMWWOUL (Working name)
- ETHNIC MINORITIES WIDOWS/WIDOWERS ORGANISATION UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STELLA AMADI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY AZUBUIKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.10k | £29.70k | £39.09k | £35.23k | £34.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.16k | £35.84k | £36.02k | £40.47k | £35.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | £15.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 October 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 October 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 September 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 September 2022 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 December 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
12 December 2021 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 221 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE TO AFRICAN, CARIBBEAN AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITIES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND THEIR CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN ONE AND FIFTEEN YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED PRIMARILY, BUT NOT NECESSARILY AS A CONSEQUENCE OF THE LOSS OF THEIR SPOUSE OR PARENT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING, SUPPORT, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING IN MATTERS SUCH AS LOSS OF A SPOUSE, ADVOCACY, MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
148 WHITECROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1Y 8QN
- Phone:
- 02072532763
- Email:
- emwwoul@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window