REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, BETHLEHEM HOUSE OF WORSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities, education, community services, counselling and poverty alleviation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 27 July 2004: Standard registration
- 16 March 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RCCG BETHLEHEM HOUSE OF WORSHIP (Working name)
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD JUBILEE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £3.39k | £2.24k | £4.25k | £4.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £2.25k | £1.76k | £2.62k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 8 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window