Accounts and annual returns IN HIM LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1106760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 March 2025 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required