THE HCA INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health by the provision of financial and other assistance for medical facilities, medical education and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 2004: Standard registration
- THE HCA FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE HCA INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Randal Midkiff | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Vickery | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clifford Bucknall | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £80.33k | £14.06k | £293 | £283 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 December 2024 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 16TH MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR MEDICAL FACILITIES MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HCA Healthcare Uk
2 Cavendish Square
LONDON
W1G 0PU
- Phone:
- 02076164848
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window