Financial history SHAWFIELD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.20k £3.81k £3.56k £6.05k £6.73k
Total expenditure £4.25k £2.11k £428 £7.25k £10.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A