Financial history COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SOUTH LAKELAND

Charity number: 1105221
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £31.96k £18.89k £21.91k £20.48k £18.38k
Total expenditure £19.46k £19.41k £21.62k £21.61k £19.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A