Financial history LYNDHURST PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.85k £1.09k £3.89k £2.17k £2.10k
Total expenditure £1.05k £1.02k £1.13k £10.38k £1.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A