TEES VALLEY CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote interests of all residents of the Tees Valley area, in particular but not exclusively the Chinese community - foster social inclusion through the delivery of services focusing on attracting excluded groups from disadvantaged/minority groups. Provide facilities to improve the social and economic well-being. Encourage healthy lifestyle. Advance education for all age groups and run a Chinese
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 12 November 2004: Standard registration
- TEES VALLEY CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEW LIM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY CHAN | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
JACKIE TIN CHEUNG | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAI CHOI LEUNG | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ESPERANZA CHOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHOON DEE NEOH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANNY CHAU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOM HA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAI TUNG HO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIMMY CHOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.48k | £11.93k | £18.74k | £16.38k | £27.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.49k | £31.73k | £32.88k | £30.29k | £44.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 September 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLESBROUGH, STOCKTON, HARTLEPOOL REDCAR CLEVELAND AND DARLINGTON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE CHINESE COMMUNITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
MIDLESBROUGH, STOCKTON, HARTLEPOOL, REDCAR CLEVELAND AND DARLINGTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Davies Tracey Ltd
Swan House
Westpoint Road
Thornaby
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS17 6BP
- Phone:
- 01642606003
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window