Governing document ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY NETWORK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/02/2013 as amended on 06 Jan 2025 as amended on 29 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects are specifically restricted to the following: To promote such charitable purposes as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion think fit including in particular but not so as to bind the generality of the foregoing for the public benefit: ? To promote healthy living and to relieve poverty, sickness and distress, through the resourcing of community-based services which may include: -Financial inclusion, debt advice, and welfare benefits advice services to assist members of the community to manage and reduce debt, and to maximise their income and so relieve poverty; ? The prevention and relief of poverty by the hosting of North Liverpool Foodbank, which promotes healthy living through growing sustainable communities, building financial resilience and food security together. And such other activities that relieve poverty, sickness and distress and promote healthy living as the Trustees shall from time to time determine;
Area of benefit
IN THE GROUNDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST ANDREW CLUBMOOR LIVERPOOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CLUBMOOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.