Financial history THE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATION FOR UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES

Charity number: 1106172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £621.22k £500.43k £473.66k £837.36k £925.47k
Total expenditure £648.76k £541.80k £491.11k £627.28k £823.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £132.54k £114.63k £122.31k £302.09k £224.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A £341 £1.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £620.34k £499.69k N/A £836.75k £921.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £886 £733 N/A £275 £3.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £648.76k £541.80k N/A £627.28k £823.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.53k £23.28k N/A £13.92k £16.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0