The Redstone Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF GRANTS IN LINE WITH THE TRUST DEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 August 2004: Standard registration
- AHAVAS TZEDOKOH VOCHESED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Enoch Aaron Royde | Chair | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moshe Royde | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Royde | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Royde | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.92k | £37.57k | £15.08k | £293 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.71k | £29.48k | £19.21k | £10.29k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JULY 2004 as amended on 03 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE BELIEFS AND VALUES OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH ORTHODOX RELIGION; 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND HARDSHIP IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 Leicester Road
SALFORD
M7 4HJ
- Phone:
- 07791 361251
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window