REDCLIFFE EARLY YEARS CENTRE PTA

Charity number: 1105280
Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds for Redcliffe Nursery & Childrens Centre

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021

Total income: £2,892
Total expenditure: £14,724

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Mary McGough Chair 02 November 2021
None on record
Holly Elizabeth Alpren Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Jessica Manuel Trustee 22 June 2020
None on record
Lyn Shorland Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £730 £5.17k £9.80k £12.12k £2.89k
Total expenditure £3.93k £8.12k £1.32k £400 £14.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 September 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
REDCLIFFE CHILDRENS CENTRE
SPENCER HOUSE
SHIP LANE
BRISTOL
BS1 6RR
Phone:
01179030334