BOURNEMOUTH COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a low cost service to the community: conflict resolution between neighbours, families, workplace, consumers or employers. Mediation requires the parties in dispute to have the right mindset for resolving their disputes. For this, we recommend a degree of present moment awareness, we call mindfulness. Mindfulness coaching is a necessary element in the mediation process we provide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 September 2004: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 October 2009: Standard registration
- MINDFUL MEDIATION (Working name)
- BOURNEMOUTH COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
- JUST MEDIATE ; GLOBAL COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
- MEDIATION FIRST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNABELLE LAZENBY-RUSSELL | Chair | 28 May 2004 |
|
|
||||
Laura Louise Galbraith | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Craig Daffern | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £0 | £210 | £1.77k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £344 | £23 | £3.43k | £547 | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BOURNEMOUTH AREA COMMUNITY, THE PROVISION OF INDEPENDENT MEDIATION SERVICES FOR INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS EXPERIENCING OR THREATENED BY DISPUTE OR CONFLICT, SUCH AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, NEIGHBOUR NUISANCE, ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, HARASSMENT, BULLYING, FAMILY OR COMMUNITY CONFLICT WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER AND FOR THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH AREA COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSAMUND HOUSE
5 Woodside Road
POOLE
BH14 9JH
- Phone:
- 01202245738
- Email:
- justmediate@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window