HOME-START MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with families across Manchester who have at least one child under the age of 5 and are facing emotional or parenting difficulties. We recruit and train volunteers who visit the families each week to offer them emotional and practical support in their own home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £225,500 from 3 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- HOME-START MANCHESTER SOUTH (Previous name)
- HOME-START MANCHESTER WYTHENSHAWE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emile Pinel | Chair | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aoife Spillane | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holleigh Stevenson | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shakiba Zulfiqar Ahsen | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Waddington | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Boaler | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wright | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karin Connell | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £314.03k | £374.55k | £415.65k | £415.63k | £488.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.11k | £327.82k | £373.33k | £368.48k | £506.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £58.38k | N/A | N/A | £225.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £79.11k | £81.19k | £115.61k | £123.75k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 DEC 2017 as amended on 24 Feb 2025 as amended on 24 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
A. TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B. TO PREVENT CRUELTY OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN MANCHESTER.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER WYTHENSHAWE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manchester City Council
Woodville Childrens Centre
Shirley Road
MANCHESTER
M8 0NE
- Phone:
- 0161 721 4493
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window