KATCANDO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small idependent local charity, raising money for local cancer care. Fundraising activities include dinner dances, barn dance, quiz night, bridge evening and cake/book stalls at numerous fetes. Money raised is used to buy/contribute towards items for use in cancer care at local hospitals and hospices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 November 2004: Standard registration
- KATCANDO FRIMLEY APPEAL FOR CANCER PATIENTS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ingrid Long | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY COLES | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL BUCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET HOBDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENDRA EVE CARDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA LESLIE MOWAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN CHARLES GILBERT COLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE GRACE BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.74k | £14.46k | £9.76k | £10.41k | £15.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.98k | £11.21k | £5.50k | £16.34k | £14.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CANCER PATIENTS FROM HOSPITALS IN NORTH EAST HAMPSHIRE AND SOUTH WEST SURREY WHO ARE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST HAMPSHIRE AND SOUTH WEST SURREY .
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LUDLOW CLOSE
FRIMLEY
CAMBERLEY
GU16 9FE
- Phone:
- 07800506651
- Email:
- katcando.appeal@virgin.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window