THE GENTLEMEN SONGSTERS MALE VOICE CHOIR CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By our practise, promotion and study of music, often in association with other like minded bodies, we aim to foster public knowledge and appreciation of music by means of public performance. Such public performances enable us to raise funds which are then used to benefit local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- City Of London
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 September 2004: Standard registration
- GSMVC (Working name)
- THE SONGSTERS (Working name)
- THE GENTLEMEN SONGSTERS MALE VOICE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Holden | Chair | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ken Crane | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hayden Molyneux | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HENRY MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.80k | £29.99k | £7.34k | £19.21k | £45.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.28k | £30.80k | £9.63k | £14.80k | £43.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRACTICE, PROMOTE AND STUDY MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DUDLEY MBC, SANDWELL MBC, WEST BROMWICH, BIRMINGHAM AND CENTRAL LONDON (ALBERT HALL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Brooklands Drive
KIDDERMINSTER
DY11 5EB
- Phone:
- 01562 910094
- Email:
- gsmvchoir@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window