Financial history THE THREE RIVERS PARTNERSHIP, DORSET

Charity number: 1106977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.92k £31.96k £33.37k £61.96k £58.63k
Total expenditure £40.11k £51.42k £40.57k £57.75k £61.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.90k £23.50k £13.40k £43.11k £30.80k