FRIENDS OF BRACKENFIELD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to enhance the experience of Brackenfield School pupils and their enjoyment of school life by funding educational activities, to support the wider community and school's chosen charities. Funds to do this are raised at several fundraising events (e.g. Christmas fair, sale of pre owned uniform and various social events) organised by the FOBS committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Barros | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hutchinson | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martina Parkinson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £2.21k | £3.53k | £11.11k | £16.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £2.21k | £4.27k | £12.51k | £15.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT BRACKENFIELD SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF BRACKENFIELD SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Duchy Road
Harrogate
HG1 2HE
- Phone:
- 01423508558
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window