OASIS RETREAT-RETORNO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity shall be the relief of poverty and the relief of the ill, feeble and frail among persons of the jewish faith throughout the world primarily but not exclusively among such persons living in israel or the united kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
Governance
- 22 September 2004: Standard registration
- Chesed Yiboneh (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF ANIYEI YISROEL (Previous name)
- OASIS RETREAT (Previous name)
- YESHIVAT TORAT HACHEN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Mimran | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allan David Raffles | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/09/2020 | 06/09/2021 | 06/09/2022 | 06/09/2023 | 06/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £7.50k | £5.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £7.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2011 as amended on 01 May 2021 as amended on 19 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THE ILL, FEEBLE AND FRAIL AMONG PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG SUCH PERSONS LIVING IN ISRAEL OR THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSONS QUALIFY AS OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE BUT PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLSUIVELY THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 GRASMERE STREET
GATESHEAD
NE8 1TR
- Phone:
- 01914477456
- Email:
- chesedyiboneh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window