THE ARTHUR ANSON MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of facilities, amenities and services for use by the inhabitants of the parish of Marcham and its neighbourhood and the relief of persons resident in the parish who are in need, hardship or distress (including making of grants to bodies who provide goods, services or facilities to them).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richard Wilson | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Gillham | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Brace | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Graham Finch | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Helen Stevens | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS HILLIER | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £7.10k | £17.60k | £26.43k | £27.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.68k | £5.36k | £0 | £6.61k | £29.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 JULY 2008 AND 15 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MARCHAM AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS MEETINGS OR SERVICES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; II) THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS (OTHER THAN POLITICAL MEETINGS), LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS BY: I) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 The Farthings
Marcham
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX13 6QD
- Phone:
- 07944 204493
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window