Trustees DR KERSHAW'S HOSPICE
Charity Number: 1105924

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA NICHOLLS | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FLEMING | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HESSELGROVE WARD | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DARYL IAN MARTIN KITCHENER | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Jones | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Buchanan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hadfield | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Macdonald | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Schofield | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Damianou | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr PAUL RUSSELL COOK | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Lipton | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.