Financial history PRESTON SOCIAL SUPPORT GROUP FOR DEAFENED PEOPLE

Charity Number: 1106282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.40k £240 £21 £123 £272
Total expenditure £1.42k £145 £102 £860 £831
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A