PRESTON SOCIAL SUPPORT GROUP FOR DEAFENED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social outings, coffee mornings for deafened people, friends and family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Mary Dean | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hallas Treasurer | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Riley | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Gornall | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARY CARMICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/02/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £240 | £21 | £123 | £272 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £145 | £102 | £860 | £831 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2020 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
- TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF, REHABILITATION, EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF DEAFENED PEOPLE (WHO ARE DEFINED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS THOSE PERSONS WITH SEVERE OR PROFOUND ACQUIRED HEARING LOSS) BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE; - TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF DEAFENED PEOPLE, HEARING PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND CARERS OF DEAFENED PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 SHAROE MOUNT AVENUE
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 9HQ
- Phone:
- 01772718270
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window