HORN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To relief of in particular but not exclusively people of Somali descent refugees and asylum seekers in Birmingham and surrounding areas and Somalia and Djibouti. 2) Advancement of education 3) To raise awareness against poverty, 4) Provide and promote the necessity of ignoration 5) provide Environmental Awareness.6) to raise awareness and prevalence of autism and mental health illnesses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Djibouti
- Somalia
Governance
- 06 August 2004: Standard registration
- HORN TRUST (Working name)
- HORN FORUM LIMITED (Previous name)
- HORN FORUM TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDIKHEDIR HASSAN MOHAMOUD | Chair | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED DAHIR SHARIF ALI | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AYAN MOHAMED SHARIF | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £5.24k | £0 | £5.15k | £4.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.22k | £5.22k | £0 | £4.80k | £4.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/05/2014 as amended on 31 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR), TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE COMMUNITY, STATUETTE AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 5
508 Moseley Road
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9AH
- Phone:
- 01212859428
- Email:
- INFO@HORNTRUST.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window