BEDWORTH HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the main area of activity is to provide facilities for and promote leisure and recreational activities in the interest of social welfare. to serve as focal point for regeneration in the bedworth heath area which currently ranks as the 4th most deprived ward in warwickshire. no similar facilities exist in the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 August 2004: Standard registration
- BEDWORTH HEATH LEISURE AND ACTIVITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Davies | Chair | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Pritchett | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Beales | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Connell | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haley Aldington | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.06k | £65.96k | £80.93k | £84.79k | £85.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.79k | £51.15k | £63.74k | £70.72k | £81.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.41k | £2.16k | £15.44k | £12.06k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £25.00k | £9.70k | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2003 as amended on 06 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEDWORTH HEATH AND ITS ENVIRONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY AND THOSE WITH DISABILITIES, AND TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY; B) TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE AND IMPROVE THE FACILITIES OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ASSOCIATED BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bedworth Heath Community Centre
181 Smorrall Lane
BEDWORTH
CV12 0JP
- Phone:
- 02476362512
- Email:
- bheathcc@xlnmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window