Financial history ARUN COMMUNITY CHURCH WICKBOURNE CENTRE

Charity number: 1107647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £522.17k £450.11k £451.37k £440.32k £550.11k
Total expenditure £528.45k £472.52k £457.30k £435.88k £485.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £280.02k £262.97k £249.54k £247.50k £360.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.39k N/A N/A N/A £365.73k
Income - Other trading activities £126.85k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £391.94k N/A N/A N/A £38.04k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.76k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £144.59k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £479.94k N/A N/A N/A £485.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.51k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.42k N/A N/A N/A £8.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0