CHESHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist Cheshire Police and any other Police/Search and Rescue resource within mainland UK to locate and assist Missing Persons. This includes medical assistance where qualified, and to be an additional resource to assist at any major incident within mainland UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2004: Standard registration
- CHESHIRE LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryn Jones | Chair | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Horrigan | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Davies | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ross | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Dance | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Buckingham | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Broderick | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Taylor | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Pritchard | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Miss R Smith | Trustee | 11 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.64k | £56.93k | £46.88k | £58.82k | £49.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.37k | £33.46k | £40.69k | £32.71k | £42.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEVING OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENT OR NATURAL HAZARD, PRINCIPALLY IN CHESHIRE BUT WITHOUT GEOGRAPHICAL LIMITATION, AND TO SUPPORT ANY OTHER RESCUE ORGANISATION, AND TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE SECURE AND EFFICIENT SEARCH AND RESCUE OF ANY PERSONS SO ENDANGERED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheshire Search and Rescue
Unit 2 - 14 Premier Park
35 Road One Winsford Industrial Est
WINSFORD
Cheshire
CW7 3PH
- Phone:
- 0845 299 7500
- Email:
- info@cheshire-sarteam.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window