Accounts and annual returns GENERATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1105520
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2008 29 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 16 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2007 09 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 01 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2006 15 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2006 10 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2005 06 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2005 06 March 2006 On Time