BURTON CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of or assisting in the provision of facilities for the acquisition or development of vocational skills and the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation. Relief of poverty through providing guidance on employment opportunities. Provision of a community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £37,311 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE WRIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adieb Khouri | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Coombs | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE CAMPBELL | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RONALD EMMANUEL MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.46k | £80.26k | £42.56k | £83.38k | £101.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.59k | £88.16k | £66.24k | £88.24k | £125.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.65k | £23.20k | £26.65k | £37.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 DECEMBER 2003 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE INHABITANTS OF BURTON UPON TRENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') TO ACQUIRE OR DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE ON EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED. 3.3 TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE IT (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BURTON UPON TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
B C A
346 Uxbridge Street
Burton-on-Trent
DE14 3JS
- Phone:
- 01283512182
- Email:
- info@burtoncaribbean.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window