Accounts and annual returns CRONFA ELW PARK-JONES

Charity Number: 1105444
Charity reporting is up to date (289 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 April 2025 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 April 2025 289 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window