OUR RIGHT TO READ

Charity number: 1106327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide grants to students for literacy tutoring. Provide grants to teachers and volunteers for training in the Sound Reading System. Offer tutoring, training, and other support services to various Institutions - including schools, special needs schools, probationary services, and YOIs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12
Total expenditure: £4,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HENDRIK van Es Mr Chair 11 March 2013
None on record
GERALDINE CATHERINE CARTER Trustee
None on record
ANITA JOAN WEARE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.50k £0 £0 £4 £12
Total expenditure £3.35k £4.22k £5.57k £4.61k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Juxon Close
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 7AA
Phone:
01865777798
Email:
No information available
Website:

ourrighttoread.com