KINGSWAY HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS' AND FRIENDS' ACTION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 19 August 2004: Standard registration
- 24 October 2006: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- KINGSWAY ACTION GROUP (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND ITS COMMUNITY AND 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window