Accounts and annual returns HASTINGS AND ST LEONARDS FORESHORE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105649
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 February 2025 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 February 2025 391 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 February 2025 756 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 February 2025 756 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2024 984 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 October 2024 984 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window