Trustees HOME-START ASHFORD & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1105541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHANIE SENIOR Chair 02 September 2011
None on record
Katherine Amber Pauley Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
NORMA SMYTH Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Alexandra Reid Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Giovanna Gandolfo Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Julie Clare Blake Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Sara Catherine Emmerton Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Jeremy David Evans Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
KATHLEEN CORBY Trustee 07 August 2013
None on record