Financial history WINDYWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1108111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £446.68k £356.02k £508.04k £525.46k £487.28k
Total expenditure £303.66k £306.27k £324.39k £363.17k £474.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.84k £36.24k £849 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £240.34k £222.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £255.23k £287.17k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £12.10k £9.66k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £371 £5.73k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £178.85k £165.53k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £186.82k £208.57k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £7.80k £154.57k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £8.44k £9.59k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £7.18k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £150 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £129.78k £31 N/A