WINDYWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING VIA CHARITY SHOPS, ATTENDANCE AT LOCAL FAIRS AND FETES, SPONSORED WALKS, EVENTS AND OPEN DAYS. OPEN AIR CONCERTS, RAISING AWARENESS OF OUR AIMS AND OBJECTIVES THROUGH REGULAR CONTACT WITH GENERAL PUBLIC EG. NEWSLETTERS AND PUBLIC RELATIONS. PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR RESCUE, VETERINARY CARE AND REHOMING OF ABANDONED AND NEGLECTED DOMESTIC ANIMALS. OPERATING A PET FOOD BANK FOR PUBLIC USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Manchester City
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 February 2005: Standard registration
- WINDYWAY ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE, BUXTON OLD ROAD, MACCLESFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Riseley | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Arnstein | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANGELA EARLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ELSIE BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.68k | £356.02k | £508.04k | £525.46k | £487.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.66k | £306.27k | £324.39k | £363.17k | £474.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.84k | £36.24k | £849 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £240.34k | £222.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £255.23k | £287.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £12.10k | £9.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £371 | £5.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £178.85k | £165.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £186.82k | £208.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £7.80k | £154.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £8.44k | £9.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £7.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £150 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £129.78k | £31 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 20 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS, CATS OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN KENNELS, CATTERIES, REFUGES, ANIMAL HOSPITALS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED DOGS, CATS OR OTHER ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL TREATED DOGS, CATS OR OTHER ANIMALS AND TO FIND NEW HOMES FOR ANY SUCH ANIMALS AT THEIR DISCRETION THE TRUSTEES MAY SPEND ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CHESHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND GREATER MANCHESTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
164a Crompton Road
MACCLESFIELD
CHESHIRE
SK11 8EH
- Phone:
- 01625617603
- Email:
- windywaytrust@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window