CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (MOUNTAIN OF VICTORY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 27 August 2004: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, PRAYER AND DISTRIBUTION OF GOSPEL TRACTS, AND BY ENSURING THEM TO LIVE A LIFE OF RIGHTEOUSNESS, HOLINESS AND PREVAILING PRAYER. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP, BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE, TO VICTIMS OF WAR, DISASTER AND OTHER MISFORTUNE LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window