Financial history FIRE IN THE WORD PRAYER MINISTRY

Charity number: 1105592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.85k £615 £461 £1.12k £1.12k
Total expenditure £7.38k £3.36k £526 £1.67k £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A