STURMINSTER NEWTON COMMUNITY BUILDING TRUST

Charity Number: 1108652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity operates The Exchange, a community building in Sturminster Newton, for the benefit of the population of the town and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £409,679
Total expenditure: £404,413

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT COWLEY Chair
THE CHARITY OF WILLIAM WILLIAMS
Received: 53 days late
Christopher John Taylor Trustee 21 June 2021
ROTARY CLUB OF STURMINSTER NEWTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Helen Jacqueline Lacey Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Trevor Puckett Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Sarah Anne Palmer Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
JOHN COWLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £361.41k £143.26k £241.11k £327.77k £409.68k
Total expenditure £381.08k £129.59k £303.46k £357.88k £404.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.60k £43.82k £4.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 26 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 26 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 22 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 22 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Exchange
Old Market Hill
STURMINSTER NEWTON
Dorset
DT10 1FH
Phone:
01258475137
Email:
No information available
Website:

stur-exchange.co.uk