Financial history THE JEAN GROVE TRUST

Charity number: 1109593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.63k £28.75k £30.86k £27.20k £31.59k
Total expenditure £46.02k £26.47k £29.61k £30.92k £43.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A