THE LEND AND PLAY TOY LIBRARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATES LEND AND PLAY TOY LIBRARY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 20 August 2004: Standard registration
- 01 April 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 01 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1157855 FIRST DAYS CHILDREN'S CHARITY
- LEND & PLAY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.20k | £11.07k | £5.97k | £7.78k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £7.14k | £9.00k | £7.99k | £7.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 12 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TOYS FOR PLAY AND EQUIPMENT, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WOKINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window