Governing document INSTITUTE OF CONSERVATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2014 as amended on 27 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY RESEARCH INTO AND THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION OF ITEMS AND COLLECTIONS OF ITEMS OF CULTURAL, AESTHETIC, HISTORIC AND SCIENTIFIC VALUE. 2) TO PRESERVE AND CONSERVE ITEMS AND COLLECTIONS OF ITEMS OF CULTURAL, AESTHETIC, HISTORIC AND SCIENTIFIC VALUE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.