Financial history BURNING BUSH APOSTOLIC CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1105590
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.58k £31.94k £30.73k £43.36k £45.77k
Total expenditure £32.64k £5.95k £5.62k £5.90k £7.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A