THE KIM CAUDLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making donations to UK based charities supporting disadvantaged persons and animal welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA JANE CAUDLE-NICHOLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louie Roy Eyres-Scott | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Towers | Trustee | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.53k | £15.43k | £18.46k | £20.15k | £23.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £28.74k | £26.24k | £10.39k | £40.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
THE WELFARE OF AND THE RELIEF FROM SICKNESS OF ANIMALS, THE WELFARE OF AND THE RELIEF FROM SICKNESS OF CHILDREN, THE RELIEF FROM SICKNESS OF THE PUBLIC AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING 1. THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING BY HORSES, DOGS, OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN STABLES, KENNELS, REFUGES, RESCUE HOMES, ANIMAL HOSPITALS, SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF NEGLECTED HORSES, DOGS OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES AND FOR THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL TREATED HORSES, DOGS, OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES TO INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO ANY CHARITABLE CAUSES ASSOCIATED THERETO; 2. THE WELFARE OF UNDER PRIVILEGED CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN LIVING IN DEPRIVED CIRCUMSTANCES OR WHO HAVE BEEN NEGLECTED OR ILL TREATED, TO INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO ANY CHARITABLE CAUSES ASSOCIATED THERETO; AND 3. THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND EQUIPMENT OF HOSPITALS NURSING HOMES HOSPICES AND CLINICS OVER AND ABOVE THAT WHICH WOULD NORMALLY BE PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 Mill Road
Stock
INGATESTONE
Essex
CM4 9LN
- Phone:
- 07717578099
- Email:
- caudle2935@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window