Financial history LDN RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1106636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £98.05k £162.33k £108.35k £208.77k £255.38k
Total expenditure £91.26k £69.04k £54.60k £136.95k £106.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A