JEWISH COMMUNITY CENTRE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education in Jewish history, culture, and customs. Provision of, or assistance in the provision of, facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation, in the interest of social welfare, particularly, but not exclusively, for Jewish people, with the object of improving the conditions of life of those using the facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 August 2004: Standard registration
- 14 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- JCC UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JULY 2004 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 MARCH 2007 AND 11 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN JEWISH HISTORY, CULTURE AND CUSTOMS OR SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE; 3.2 THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR JEWISH PEOPLE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE USING THE FACILITIES; 3.3 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY IN LONDON, BY ESTABLISHING A COMMUNITY CENTRE, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES, IN THEIR DISCRETION, DETERMINE; AND 3.4 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window