Financial history CHRIST FAITH TABERNACLE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1105674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.66m £1.85m £2.05m £2.13m £2.39m
Total expenditure £1.23m £972.85k £1.09m £1.57m £1.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.63m £1.80m £2.00m £2.05m £2.22m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £31.82k
Income - Other £35.52k £47.26k £49.59k £87.72k £132.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £867.78k £986.30k £1.40m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.16k £12.76k £11.30k £13.64k £15.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £131.90k £105.07k £106.92k £176.81k £216.76k